Hudgins v. Collecto, Inc.
Plaintiff: Triston Hudgins
Defendant: Collecto, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv00234
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 12/3/2020 10:30 AM in Midland before Judge David Counts, Jury Selection set for 1/4/2021 08:00 AM in Midland before Judge David Counts, Jury Trial set for 1/4/2021 08:00 AM in Midland before Judge David Counts. Signed by Judge David Counts. (se)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 Scheduling Recommendations by Collecto, Inc.. (Messenger, Kandy)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order It is ORDERED Kyle Stephen Deese's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Doc. #7 filed October 31, 2019, is GRANTED. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. It is further ORDERED that if Mr. Deese has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kyle Stephen Deese (Filing fee $ 100.00 receipt number 700015585) by Triston Hudgins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(se)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge David Counts. (se)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Collecto, Inc.. (Messenger, Kandy)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Attorney Kyle Deese as to Triston Hudgins. (se)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to JS 44 by Collecto, Inc.. (Messenger, Kandy)
October 10, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (se)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Collecto, Inc.. (Messenger, Kandy)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Collecto, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12712948), filed by Collecto, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Messenger, Kandy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudgins v. Collecto, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collecto, Inc.
Represented By: Kandy E. Messenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triston Hudgins
Represented By: Kyle Deese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?