Shah v. Luxe Energy LLC et al
Plaintiff: PETER SHAH
Defendant: LUXE ENERGY LLC and GRAY SURFACE SPECIALITIES & CONSULTING LLC
Case Number: 7:2020cv00003
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Craig L. Dowis on behalf of Gray Surface Specialities & Consulting LLC. Attorney Craig L. Dowis added to party Gray Surface Specialities & Consulting LLC(pty:dft) (Dowis, Craig)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. To the extent the Court's permission is required for Plaintiff to receive service and notice of filings electronically pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 5(b)(2)(E) and 77(d), it is GRANTED. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as)
January 13, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION FOR CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Peter Shah. (see)
January 7, 2020 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (see)
January 7, 2020 Filing 11 Case electronically transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:19-cv-19580.
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order transferring case to District of United states District Court for the Western District of Texas, Midland Division;, ORDER OF DISMISSAL Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 1/6/2020. (abr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/7/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from Jonathan M. Korn, Esquire re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. (KORN, JONATHAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/7/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by PETER SHAH. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope)(jem) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/7/2020.]
December 17, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. Motion set for 1/21/2020 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/7/2020.]
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by LUXE ENERGY LLC. Responses due by 1/7/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Jonathan M. Korn, Esquire, #3 Declaration of Sam Patranella, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(KORN, JONATHAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/7/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN M. KORN on behalf of LUXE ENERGY LLC (KORN, JONATHAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/7/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GRAY SURFACE SPECIALITIES & CONSULTING LLC. (COYNE, PATRICK) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/7/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against LUXE ENERGY LLC by GRAY SURFACE SPECIALITIES & CONSULTING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Service)(COYNE, PATRICK) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/7/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to Luxe Energy LLC by PETER SHAH. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jem) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/7/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GRAY SURFACE SPECIALITIES & CONSULTING LLC, LUXE ENERGY LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/7/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GRAY SURFACE SPECIALITIES & CONSULTING LLC, LUXE ENERGY LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number TRE107080) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PETER SHAH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certified Statement for Complaint, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Envelope)(mg) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/7/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shah v. Luxe Energy LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUXE ENERGY LLC
Represented By: JONATHAN M. KORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAY SURFACE SPECIALITIES & CONSULTING LLC
Represented By: PATRICK M. COYNE
Represented By: Craig L. Dowis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETER SHAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?