Martinez et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jesus Martinez and Maria Sarabia
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2021cv00145
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, re #5 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Maria Sarabia, Plaintiff Jesus Martinez (Stephens, David)
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Jesus Martinez, Maria Sarabia. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint)(Sierra, Eduardo)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge David Counts. (se)
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Original Petition by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Saldana, Juan)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO AMEND PLEADINGS. Signed by Judge David Counts. (se)
August 27, 2021 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ja)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-15163315), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplement)(Saldana, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Martinez
Represented By: Eduardo A. Sierra
Represented By: Israel L. Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Sarabia
Represented By: Eduardo A. Sierra
Represented By: Israel L. Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Juan Daniel Saldana
Represented By: David R. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?