Vega v. State of Texas
Petitioner: Raul Julian Vega
Respondent: State of Texas
Case Number: 7:2021cv00163
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Filing 11 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge David Counts. (jb3)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge David Counts. (jb3)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge David Counts. (jb3)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order TERMINATING DOC. #5 Motion entered by Judge David Counts. Petitioner's pleading was docketed as a Motion. However, the Court construes the pleading as a supplement to his Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and will consider it as such.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlm)
October 1, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Raul Julian Vega. (jb3)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Raul Julian Vega. Show Cause Response due by 10/20/2021. Signed by Judge David Counts. (jb3)
September 27, 2021 Filing 6 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Raul Julian Vega.(slt)
September 20, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION by Raul Julian Vega. (slt)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Signed by Judge David Counts. (Attachments: #1 In Forma Pauperis Application)(jb3)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SUBMIT MOTION ON PROPER FORM re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Raul Julian Vega. Signed by Judge David Counts. (Attachments: #1 Blank 2241 Peition)(jb3)
September 14, 2021 Filing 2 Case Opening Letter as to Raul Julian Vega. (se)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.00-DUE), filed by Raul Julian Vega.(se)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vega v. State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Raul Julian Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?