Morgan v. Pioneer Natural Resources Company
Plaintiff: Willie Morgan
Defendant: Pioneer Natural Resources Company
Case Number: 7:2021cv00174
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Referring Judge: Ronald C Griffin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Ronald C. Griffin. Pursuant to the Standing Order on Case Management found at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/index.html#midland> Standing. (sg)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by Judge David Counts. (sg)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge David Counts. (sg)
October 28, 2021 Filing 5 Pioneer Natural's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Willie Morgan. Attorney Jana Hale Woelfel added to party Pioneer Natural Resources Company(pty:dft) by Pioneer Natural Resources Company.(Woelfel, Jana)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Willie Morgan. Pioneer Natural Resources Company served on 9/30/2021, answer due 10/21/2021. (Josephson, Michael)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Pioneer Natural Resources Company. (kg)
September 27, 2021 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kg)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Willie Morgan. (Josephson, Michael)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15269968), filed by Willie Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Josephson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan v. Pioneer Natural Resources Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Morgan
Represented By: Andrew W. Dunlap
Represented By: Carl A. Fitz
Represented By: Richard J. Burch
Represented By: Michael A. Josephson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Natural Resources Company
Represented By: Jana Hale Woelfel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?