Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Wash That Baby, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Wash That Baby, LLC d/b/a The Hut Bar & Grill and d/b/a Jamaican Jerk Hut Bar and Grill, Melanie L. Spratt and George B. Ali
Case Number: 7:2021cv00211
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Referring Judge: Ronald C Griffin
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2022 Filing 6 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc., re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Original Answer filed by Defendant Melanie L. Spratt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B(1), #4 Exhibit B(2), #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit C(1), #7 Exhibit C(2), #8 Exhibit C(3), #9 Exhibit C(4))(King, Jamie)
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Original Answer by Melanie L. Spratt.. Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Petty, Ben)
December 13, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Melanie L. Spratt served on 12/1/2021, answer due 12/22/2021. (King, Jamie)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to George B. Ali, Melanie L. Spratt, Wash That Baby, LLC. (sg)
November 8, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Ronald C. Griffin pursuant to the Standing Order on Case Management found at #Standing Order . (sg)
November 8, 2021 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (sg)
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (King, Jamie)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15420074), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(King, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Wash That Baby, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wash That Baby, LLC d/b/a The Hut Bar & Grill and d/b/a Jamaican Jerk Hut Bar and Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie L. Spratt
Represented By: Ben Petty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George B. Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?