MTP Hospitality Solutions, Inc. v. Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Plaintiff: MTP Hospitality Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2023cv00099
Filed: June 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Referring Judge: Ronald C Griffin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2023 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Affiliated FM Insurance Company, re #10 MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff MTP Hospitality Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Proposed Order)(O'Malley, Shannon)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING IN PART #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is extended to Tuesday, September 5, 2023. It is so ORDERED. The Court notes that the requested date of Monday, September 4, 2023, is a federal holiday. Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
August 18, 2023 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by MTP Hospitality Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Loyd, Shannon)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. It is ORDERED Defendant Affiliated FM Insurance Company's deadline to file a Response to Plaintiff MTP Hospitality Solutions, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ECF No. 8) is extended to Monday, August 21, 2023. It is so ORDERED. Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
August 10, 2023 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Defendant's Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) by Affiliated FM Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (O'Brien, Michael)
August 10, 2023 Filing 13 Scheduling Recommendations by Affiliated FM Insurance Company. (O'Malley, Shannon)
August 8, 2023 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Affiliated FM Insurance Company, re #6 MOTION to Compel Appraisal and Abate Litigation Pending Completion of Appraisal filed by Defendant Affiliated FM Insurance Company (O'Brien, Michael)
August 1, 2023 Filing 11 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by MTP Hospitality Solutions, Inc., re #6 MOTION to Compel Appraisal and Abate Litigation Pending Completion of Appraisal filed by Defendant Affiliated FM Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order)(Loyd, Shannon)
August 1, 2023 Filing 10 Amended Motion for Summary Judgment #8 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by MTP Hospitality Solutions, Inc. Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Loyd, Shannon) Modified on 8/8/2023 per chambers (kg).
August 1, 2023 Filing 9 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to Deficiency Notice, #8 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by MTP Hospitality Solutions, Inc.. (Loyd, Shannon)
August 1, 2023 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #8 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment : Proposed order does not have signature block for Judge. Please add signature block and refile proposed order only using the "Attachments" event. (kg)
July 31, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by MTP Hospitality Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Loyd, Shannon)
July 18, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Designation of Lead Counsel by MTP Hospitality Solutions, Inc. (Loyd, Shannon)
July 18, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Compel Appraisal and Abate Litigation Pending Completion of Appraisal by Affiliated FM Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (O'Brien, Michael)
July 11, 2023 Filing 5 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Affiliated FM Insurance Company. (O'Malley, Shannon)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by Judge David Counts. (kg)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge David Counts. (kg)
July 7, 2023 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (and Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition) by Affiliated FM Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(O'Malley, Shannon)
June 30, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Affiliated FM Insurance Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number ATXWDC-17612402), filed by Affiliated FM Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A (State Court Docket Sheet), #4 Exhibit A-1 (Plaintiff's Original Petition), #5 Exhibit A-2 (Service of Def), #6 Exhibit B (Diversity Docs))(O'Malley, Shannon)
June 30, 2023 Case assigned to Judge David Counts and Judge Ronald C. Griffin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MTP Hospitality Solutions, Inc. v. Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MTP Hospitality Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Andrew Pollom
Represented By: Shannon E. Loyd
Represented By: Charles Wayne King
Represented By: Edward Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Patrick O'Brien
Represented By: Shannon M. O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?