Zisumbo v. Ogden Regional Medical Center

Plaintiff: Raymond L. Zisumbo
Defendant: Ogden Regional Medical Center
Case Number: 1:2010cv00073
Filed: May 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Northern Office
County: Weber
Presiding Judge: Samuel Alba
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - granting in part and denying in part 193 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 196 Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendant is ORDERED to pay $93,212.00 to Plaintiff for attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 2/4/14. (ss)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 198 Defendant's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 1/27/14. (ss)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 150 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law ; granting in part and denying in part 159 Motion for Equitable Relief of Back Pay and Reinstatement; denying 165 Motion to Strike: judgment to be entered in favor of Plaintiff in the amount of $72,728.04 plus prejudgment interest at 10 percent, and case closed forthwith. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 11/22/12 (alt)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDERdenying 108 Motion in Limine Re: Legal Problems. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 7/26/13. (ss)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDERdenying 73 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 6/5/13. (ss)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDERdenying 78 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 6/3/13. (ss)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 41 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 3/22/13. (ss)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 46 Motion to Stay Proceedings. Plaintiff is hereby directed to respond to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment (DocketNo. 41) within twenty-eight (28) days. Failure to respond may result in dismissal of this case. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 12/13/12. (ss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zisumbo v. Ogden Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond L. Zisumbo
Represented By: April L. Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ogden Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?