Orbit Irrigation Products v. Sunhills International
Plaintiff: Orbit Irrigation Products
Defendant: Sunhills International
Case Number: 1:2010cv00113
Filed: July 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Northern Office
County: Davis
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 381 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 355 Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Default Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 356 Plaintiff's Motion for Additional Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 11/30/2015. (blh)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 380 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 344 Sunhills Defendants Motion for Entry of Partial Summary Judgment ; denying 345 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 348 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 372 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 11/25/2015. (jds)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 332 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER denying 318 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying without prejudice 247 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 248 Motion for Permanent Injunction; granting in part and denying in part 284 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 3/25/2015. (blh)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 237 MEMORANDUM DECISION ADOPTING IN PART THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 207 Report and Recommendations. The Court adopts the Report and Recommendation to the extent it recommends that the Court find the Hongchen Defendants to be in c ontempt and awards Plaintiff reasonable costs and attorneys fees expended in litigating this issue. Plaintiff is instructed to file a properly supported motion for attorneys fees and costs within fourteen (14) days. Plaintiffs Motion for Terminating Sanctions Against the Hongchen Defendants 169 is GRANTED. Plaintiff is instructed to provide the Court with a proposed permanent injunction with legal support for this Courts review within fourteen (14) days of this Order. The Hongchen Defendants shall have fourteen (14) days from the filing of the proposed permanent injunction to file any response, if so desired. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 4/2/14. (ss)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 193 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 10/30/2013. (asp)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 152 Motion to Stay. Orbit shall file its opposition to the Motion to Consolidate within fourteen days after an Order has been issued on the Motion to Remand in Case No. 1:13-cv-55. The Defendants may then have seven days to file their reply. The court declines Orbits request to award attorneys fees and costs incurred in the filing of its Motion for an Extension. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 05/06/2013. (asp)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER denying 68 Defendants Taizhou Dongfang Light Decorations, Zhejiang Hongchen Irrigation Equipment Co., and Luo Jun's Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/02/2012. (tls)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orbit Irrigation Products v. Sunhills International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orbit Irrigation Products
Represented By: Arthur B. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunhills International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?