A.W. et al v. Davis School District Featured Case
Plaintiff: A.W. and C.W.
Defendant: Davis School District
Case Number: 1:2012cv00242
Filed: November 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Northern Office
County: Davis
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J. Furse
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 22 Motion to Dismiss ; dismissing 2 Complaint with prejudice ; denying as moot 13 Motion to Certify Class ; the Court hereby incorporates the terms of the Universal Settlement and Release of All Claims into this Order, and retains jurisdiction for purposes of enforcing the terms of settlement agreement, as agreed to by the parties. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2); Kokkonen v. Guardian Life Ins. Co., 511 U.S. 375, 37881 (1994); Morris v. City of Hobart, 39 F.3d 1105, 1110-11 (10th Cir. 1994); Floyd v. Ortiz, 300 F.3d 1223, 1226 & n.3 (10th Cir. 2002). Case Closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 02/01/2013. (asp)
January 31, 2013 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs A.W., C.W.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mejia, John)
January 4, 2013 Filing 21 NOTICE FROM THE COURT New rules governing civil cases are now in effect. The Approved Amendments to the Local Rules and Updated Rules are posted on the courts website. All new requirements are important but the most significant changes are in motion practice and sealed filings. Judge Furse will order that counsel refile summary judgment motions which do not follow the new standards.DUCivR 5-2 Filing Cases and Documents Under Court SealDUCivR 7-1 Motions and MemorandaDUCivR 26-2 Standard Protective Order and Stays of DepositionsDUCivR 56-1 Summary Judgment: Motions and Supporting Memoranda (euj)
December 21, 2012 Filing 20 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Plaintiffs A.W., C.W., Defendant Davis School District. (alp)
December 21, 2012 Filing 19 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs A.W., C.W.. (alp)
December 21, 2012 Filing 18 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Davis School District. (alp)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 13 MOTION to Certify Class and Memorandum in Support. Responses due by 2/1/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 12/21/12. (alp)
December 19, 2012 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 MOTION to Certify Class and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Davis School District. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaiser, Kyle)
December 11, 2012 Filing 15 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs A.W., C.W., Defendant Davis School District. Form due by 12/26/2012. (alp)
December 11, 2012 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs A.W., C.W., Defendant Davis School District. (alp)
December 10, 2012 Filing 13 MOTION to Certify Class and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs A.W., C.W.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farrell, Leah)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 2 Complaint,. Answer deadline updated for Davis School District answer due 2/1/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 12/06/2012. (asp)
December 6, 2012 Filing 11 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendant Davis School District. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaiser, Kyle)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET TEXT ORDER denying 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for lack of statement of good cause to justify the extension. The Court will entertain a renewed motion with further explanation if Defendant wishes to file one. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 12/5/2012. No attached document. (euj)
December 4, 2012 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Complaint, filed by Defendant Davis School District. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cheney, Scott)
November 19, 2012 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by C.W., A.W. as to Davis School District served on 11/19/2012, answer due 12/10/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Farrell, Leah)
November 16, 2012 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Davis School District. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (rls)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Leslie Cooper for A.W.,Leslie Cooper for C.W.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/13/12. (alp)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joshua Block for A.W.,Joshua Block for C.W.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/13/12. (alp)
November 13, 2012 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Leslie Cooper , Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1715050, filed by Plaintiffs A.W., C.W.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Mejia, John)
November 13, 2012 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joshua Block , Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1715041, filed by Plaintiffs A.W., C.W.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Mejia, John)
November 13, 2012 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Davis School District (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 1088-1714904), filed by C.W., A.W.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Mejia, John)
November 13, 2012 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiffs A.W., C.W. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 350.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (jds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.W. et al v. Davis School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.W.
Represented By: Joshua A. Block
Represented By: Leslie Cooper
Represented By: Leah M. Farrell
Represented By: John M. Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.W.
Represented By: Joshua A. Block
Represented By: Leslie Cooper
Represented By: Leah M. Farrell
Represented By: John M. Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?