Lauer v. Credit Collection Services
Plaintiff: Larry Lauer
Defendant: Credit Collection Services
Case Number: 1:2014cv00062
Filed: May 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Northern Office
County: Weber
Presiding Judge: Dustin B. Pead
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 38 Motion for Order Finding Plaintiff's Complaint Filed in Bad Faith. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 4/6/16 (alt)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 18 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 9/29/15 (alt)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER-granting 19 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint- 1. Mr. Lauer shall immediately file the amended complaint as provided in his motion. 2. Defendant shall file an amended answer before April 27, 2015. 3. T he parties may conduct additional discovery until May 22, 2015, focused solely on the two new sentences in the amended complaint. Depositions taken of persons previously deposed shall not exceed 3 hours. 4. The dispositive motion deadline is extended from May 8, 2015 to June 6, 2015.Dated April 13, 2015. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 4/13/2015. (las)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lauer v. Credit Collection Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Lauer
Represented By: Joshua R. Trigsted
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Collection Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?