1.800. Vending v. Wyland et al
Plaintiff: 1.800. Vending
Defendant: Chris Wyland, Grow Franchise Group, Sprout Healthy Vending and Grow Healthy
Case Number: 1:2014cv00121
Filed: October 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Northern Office
County: Davis
Presiding Judge: Dustin B. Pead
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER DENYING MOTION TO CERTIFY A QUESTION-denying 86 Motion for Certification of Issue to State Supreme Court. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 1/10/17. (jmr)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order-On or before July 7, 2016, Plaintiff shall plead the citizenship of Grow Franchise Group, LLC and Sprout Healthy Vending, LLC. It shall also allege the citizenship of each of the Doe defendants. If diversity jurisdiction is not established, this case will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 6/15/16. (jmr)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM DECISION & SHORT FORM DISCOVERY ORDER- granting 36 Motion to Compel; terminating 36 Motion to Expedite. The Court Orders the following: Within twenty (20) days from the date of this Order Defendant shall clarify its a nswer to Plaintiff's Interrogatory Number 1 and specifically identify the requested computers and electronic devices used by Defendant and Defendant's representatives from January 1, 2010 through the date of Defendant's response. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 4/21/15. (jmr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1.800. Vending v. Wyland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1.800. Vending
Represented By: Richard D Burbidge
Represented By: Jefferson W. Gross
Represented By: Ian Hiatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Wyland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grow Franchise Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprout Healthy Vending
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grow Healthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?