USA v. Talmage et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Ronald B. Talmage, Annette C. Talmage, Western Land & Livestock and Western Reserve Mortgage
Case Number: 1:2016cv00019
Filed: February 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Northern Office
County: Weber
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J. Furse
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 338 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part 328 Motion to Alter/Amend paragraphs 4 and 5 of 325 Judgment. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 12/2/19 (alt)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 246 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 64 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 200 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 5/24/19 (alt)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 176 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 4/24/19 (alt)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 240 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 205 Motion to Exclude or limit the testimony of Gary D. Olsen. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 4/24/19 (alt)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 209 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 163 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 12/28/18 (alt)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 67 Motion to Dismiss for failure to join party; granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - the second cause of action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 12/13/18 (alt)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to 190 Report and Recommendations. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/20/2018 at 01:30 PM in Rm 7.300 before Judge David Nuffer for Defendants Ronald B. Talmage and Annette C. Talmage to show cause why they should not be adjudged in civil contempt. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 11/16/18 (alt)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 130 Motion to Compel Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 6/8/17 (alt)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 70 Motion for Protective Order; granting 70 Motion for Scheduling Order Deadlines (Expert Discovery due by 10/16/2017; Motions due by 11/17/2017; Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/20 18 at 02:00 PM in Rm 3.100 before Judge David Nuffer; 10-Day Jury Trial set for 4/2/2018 at 08:30 AM in Rm 3.100 before Judge David Nuffer); granting in part and denying in part 79 Motion for Relief from Standard Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 3/17/17 (alt)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 88 Motion re Rule 56(d) re 64 MOTION for Summary Judgment; denying 84 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 3/6/17 (alt)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 31 Motion to Set Aside Default; vacating 17 Certificate of Default; finding as moot 24 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 11/22/16 (alt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Talmage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Lindsay L. Clayton(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Represented By: Jennifer Y. Golden(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Represented By: John K. Mangum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald B. Talmage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annette C. Talmage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Land & Livestock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Reserve Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?