Doe 1 et al v. Miles et al

Plaintiff: John Doe 1, Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 2, John Doe 2 and Jane Doe 4
Defendant: Female Doe2, Male Doe1, Brenda Miles and Richard Miles
Case Number: 1:2018cv00121
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Referring Judge: Brooke C Wells
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Filing 14 REQUEST for Oral Argument re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Brenda Miles, Richard Miles. (Straight, Samuel)
November 27, 2018 Filing 13 REQUEST for Decision re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, John Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4. (Vernon, Craig)
October 31, 2018 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Brenda Miles, Richard Miles. (Straight, Samuel)
October 19, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #7 filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, John Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4 (Vernon, Craig)
October 18, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order filed by Defendants Brenda Miles, Richard Miles (Straight, Samuel)
October 17, 2018 Filing 9 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, John Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Mormon Church Said To Be Keeping Files on Dissenters, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Pace Memorandum, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - HB 279, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Utah Code 78B-2-308)(Vernon, Craig)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 10/16/18. (ss)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CIVIL STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/16/18. (ss)
October 4, 2018 NAME CORRECTION of Male Doe1. Corrected Name: Richard Miles. Female Doe2. Corrected Name: Brenda Miles. Refer to document number: #4 . (Names updated per chambers.) (rks)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P. Harrington on behalf of Male Doe1, Female Doe2 (Harrington, Robert)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James S. Jardine on behalf of Male Doe1, Female Doe2 (Jardine, James)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Male Doe1, Female Doe2. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Michael George, #2 Exhibit B - Lanning Article, #3 Exhibit C - We Believe the Children, #4 Exhibit D - Snow, Ritualistic Child Abuse, #5 Exhibit E - Snow DOPL) Attorney Samuel C. Straight added to party Male Doe1(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel C. Straight added to party Female Doe2(pty:dft)(Straight, Samuel)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 Modification of Docket: Error: Counsel submitted a new complaint to the Court by email on 10/02/2018, but did not e-file the complaint or pay the e-filing until 10/03/2018 Correction: The filing date has been changed to 10/03/2018 to reflect the date the fee was actually paid and the complaint and coversheet filed re #2 Complaint. (nl)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3116460) filed by Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Jane Doe 1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Jane Doe 2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - John Doe 1 Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Jane Doe 5 Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Dr. Whitehead, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Mother 1 Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Jane Doe 3 Declaration, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Jane Doe 4 Declaration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Mother 2 Declaration, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (Vernon, Craig) Modified by adding Jane Doe 4 on 10/4/2018 (rks).
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiffs Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, John Doe 2, Jane Doe 3 is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (rks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe 1 et al v. Miles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 1
Represented By: Craig K. Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 1
Represented By: Craig K. Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 3
Represented By: Craig K. Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 2
Represented By: Craig K. Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 2
Represented By: Craig K. Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 4
Represented By: Craig K. Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Female Doe2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Male Doe1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Miles
Represented By: Samuel C. Straight
Represented By: Robert P. Harrington
Represented By: James S. Jardine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Miles
Represented By: Samuel C. Straight
Represented By: Robert P. Harrington
Represented By: James S. Jardine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?