Prieto et al v. Progressive Casualty Insurance
Plaintiff: Nancy Prieto and Daniel Prieto
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance
Case Number: 1:2019cv00041
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #10 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support for Nonjoinder, Forum Non Conveniens, Objection to Removal, Motion to Remand. Response due by 7/29/2019. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 6/10/19. No attached document. (ksb)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support for Nonjoinder, Forum Non Conveniens, Objection to Removal, Motion to Remand filed by Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order PDF) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Neilson, Chet)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support for Nonjoinder, Forum Non Conveniens, Objection to Removal, Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiffs Daniel Prieto, Nancy Prieto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Injury Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Answer to Injury Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C Settlement Agreement, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D Fraud Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E Memorandum Opposing Motion to Dismiss, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F Motion to Consolidate)(Froerer, Zane)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed) Scheduling Order)(Neilson, Chet)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Zane S. Froerer on behalf of Daniel Prieto, Nancy Prieto (Froerer, Zane)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within fourteen(14) days from the date of this order. Within Fourteen (14) days after Plaintiff proposes a schedule to defendant, the parties shall meet and confer. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/15/2019. (jds)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 5/14/19. (ss)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 5/9/19. (ss)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Daniel Prieto, Nancy Prieto and Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance. (tlh)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) with Jury Demand filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance. (Neilson, Chet)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Second District Court of Weber County, case number 190902092, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3269143) filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (Neilson, Chet)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prieto et al v. Progressive Casualty Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Prieto
Represented By: Robert L Froerer
Represented By: Zane S. Froerer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Prieto
Represented By: Robert L Froerer
Represented By: Zane S. Froerer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance
Represented By: Paul M. Belnap
Represented By: Chet W. Neilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?