Design Basics v. KH Design
Plaintiff: Design Basics
Defendant: KH Design
Case Number: 1:2019cv00051
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant KH Design. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ford, Michael)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Ford on behalf of KH Design (Ford, Michael)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. Janicki on behalf of KH Design (Janicki, Robert)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Design Basics as to KH Design served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Goebel, Heidi)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to KH Design. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sean J. Quinn for Design Basics. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 5/30/2019. (jds)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John D. LaDue for Design Basics. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 5/30/2019. (jds)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sean J. Quinn , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3286793, filed by Plaintiff Design Basics. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Exhibit B - Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order C - Proposed Order)(Goebel, Heidi)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John D. LaDue , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3286782, filed by Plaintiff Design Basics. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Exhibit B - Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order C - Proposed Order)(Goebel, Heidi)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 5/28/19. (ss)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney John D. LaDue and Sean J. Quinn, for Plaintiff Design Basics. (nl)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action mailed to the Register of Copyrights Office. (nl)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against KH Design (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3282914) filed by Design Basics. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 1551 Logan, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2208 Marshall, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2376 Dover, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (Goebel, Heidi)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiff Design Basics is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Design Basics v. KH Design
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KH Design
Represented By: Robert L. Janicki
Represented By: Michael L. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Design Basics
Represented By: Heidi G. Goebel
Represented By: John D. LaDue
Represented By: Sean J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?