Long v. Boucher et al
Plaintiff: Scott C. Long
Defendant: North Salt Lake City and Elizabeth Boucher
Case Number: 1:2019cv00056
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
2 Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #13 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 9/4/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/7/2019. (jwt)
August 7, 2019 Filing 16 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Scott C. Long. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Extend Time to Respond to MTD) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Sykes, Robert) Modified on 8/7/2019 - correcting motion event(jwt).
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Delay Scheduling and Discovery Pending Decision on Dispositive Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/11/2019. (las)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 Stipulated MOTION to Delay Scheduling and Discovery Pending Decision on Dispostive Motion filed by Defendants Elizabeth Boucher, North Salt Lake City. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(White, Heather)
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Elizabeth Boucher, North Salt Lake City. (White, Heather)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr on 7/8/2019. (las)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Danica N. Cepernich on behalf of Elizabeth Boucher, North Salt Lake City (Cepernich, Danica)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to the case. (las)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Elizabeth Boucher, North Salt Lake City. (las)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Scott C. Long. (las)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Elizabeth Boucher, North Salt Lake City, Plaintiff Scott C. Long. Form due by 7/5/2019. (las)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Elizabeth Boucher, North Salt Lake City, Plaintiff Scott C. Long. (las)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather S. White on behalf of Elizabeth Boucher, North Salt Lake City (White, Heather)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #2 Complaint, Acknowledgment filed by Elizabeth Boucher, North Salt Lake City. All Defendants. (White, Heather)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 6/12/2019. (jds)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT & Jury Demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3298639) filed by Scott C. Long. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Sykes, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Plaintiff Scott C. Long is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. Boucher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Salt Lake City
Represented By: Heather S. White
Represented By: Danica N. Cepernich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Boucher
Represented By: Heather S. White
Represented By: Danica N. Cepernich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott C. Long
Represented By: Christopher Peter Sorensen
Represented By: Robert B. Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?