Beck v. Eco Flower
Plaintiff: Stephany Beck
Defendant: Eco Flower
Case Number: 1:2019cv00073
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Bruce S Jenkins
Referring Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Conference set for 9/17/2019 at 02:00 PM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. (kms)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #3 MOTION to Certify Class: Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2019 at 02:00 PM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. (kms)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephany Beck as to Eco Flower served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Rogers, Steven)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 After review of the case, case reassigned to a District Judge per 5 Docket Text Order. Case randomly assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to the case. (las)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. Because this case is a proposed class action, it is not feasible to obtain consent from all parties to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be reassigned to a District Judge through random reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 07/26/2019. (docket text order; no attached document) (jcd)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Eco Flower. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Certify Class and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Stephany Beck. (Rogers, Steven)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3324474) filed by Stephany Beck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Rogers, Steven)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Plaintiff Stephany Beck is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beck v. Eco Flower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephany Beck
Represented By: Nicholas Reid Russell
Represented By: Steven M. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eco Flower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?