Bullock v. Knight Adjustment Bureau

Plaintiff: Heather Bullock
Defendant: Knight Adjustment Bureau
Case Number: 1:2019cv00074
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement by Heather Bullock (McBride, Ryan)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/29/2019. (jds)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/23/19. (ss)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/23/19. (ss)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/19/19. (ss)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Knight Adjustment Bureau. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Knight Adjustment Bureau (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3325617) filed by Heather Bullock. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (McBride, Ryan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiff Heather Bullock is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bullock v. Knight Adjustment Bureau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Bullock
Represented By: Theron D. Morrison
Represented By: Ryan L. McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Adjustment Bureau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?