Radford v. Utah State University Credit Union et al
Plaintiff: Curt Radford
Defendant: Utah State University Credit Union and Goldenwest Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 1:2019cv00089
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Bruce S Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12188
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Report and Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/2019 at 01:20 PM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. (The standard procedure before Judge Jenkins is to hold status and scheduling conferences in open court and on the record.) (kms)
October 2, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Goldenwest Federal Credit Union, Utah State University Credit Union. Attorney Vincent J. Velardo added to party Utah State University Credit Union(pty:dft)(Velardo, Vincent)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline updated for Goldenwest Federal Credit Union answer due 10/2/2019. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 9/20/19. (jmr)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendant Goldenwest Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Velardo, Vincent)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Rollins on behalf of Goldenwest Federal Credit Union (Rollins, Thomas)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent J. Velardo on behalf of Goldenwest Federal Credit Union (Velardo, Vincent)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Curt Radford as to Goldenwest Federal Credit Union served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Rozynski, Andrew)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Curt Radford as to Utah State University Credit Union served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Rozynski, Andrew)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Rozynski on behalf of Curt Radford (Rozynski, Andrew)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Goldenwest Federal Credit Union. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Utah State University Credit Union. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Rozynski for Curt Radford. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 8/1/19. (jmr)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Rozynski , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3345698, filed by Plaintiff Curt Radford. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Addendum of Application, #2 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Pro Hac Vice)(Allebest, Jared)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3345689) filed by Curt Radford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins (Allebest, Jared)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. Plaintiff Curt Radford is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radford v. Utah State University Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah State University Credit Union
Represented By: Vincent J. Velardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldenwest Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Thomas J. Rollins
Represented By: Vincent J. Velardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curt Radford
Represented By: Jared M. Allebest
Represented By: Andrew Rozynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?