Great Western Leasing & Sales v. Impala Transport et al
Plaintiff: Great Western Leasing & Sales
Defendant: Impala Transport and Kevin M. ONeil
Case Number: 1:2019cv00092
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/10/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 12/10/2019. Discovery due by 7/10/2020. Motions due by 7/10/2020. Status Conference set for 7/16/2020 at 02:45 PM in Rm 8.100 before Judge Clark Waddoups. (See order for other deadlines.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 9/30/2019. (jwt)
September 25, 2019 Filing 17 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Bowen, Bradley)
September 23, 2019 Filing 16 Plaintiff's/Counterclaim Defendant's ANSWER to #10 Counterclaim (Jury Demanded) filed by Great Western Leasing & Sales.(Bowen, Bradley)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Colleen L. McCoy for Impala Transport,Colleen L. McCoy for Impala Transport,Colleen L. McCoy for Kevin M. ONeil. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 9/20/19. (jmr)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John W. Greene for Impala Transport,John W. Greene for Impala Transport,John W. Greene for Kevin M. ONeil. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 9/20/19. (jmr)
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Colleen L. McCoy and Consent of Local Counsel, Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3365504, filed by Counter Claimant Impala Transport, Defendants Impala Transport, Kevin M. ONeil. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Colleen L. McCoy, #3 Exhibit B - Electronic Case Filing Registration Form - Colleen L. McCoy)(Baxter, Stevan)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John W. Greene and Consent of Local Counsel, Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3365484, filed by Counter Claimant Impala Transport, Defendants Impala Transport, Kevin M. ONeil. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice - John W. Greene, #3 Exhibit B - Electronic Case Filing Registration Form - John W. Greene)(Baxter, Stevan)
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #7 ) filed by Kevin M. ONeil. (Baxter, Stevan)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #7 ) , COUNTERCLAIM against Great Western Leasing & Sales filed by Impala Transport. (Baxter, Stevan)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 9/4/19. (jmr)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER IN RESPONSE TO DEEFNDANTS' NOTICE OF REMOVAL -re #7 Notice of Removal,, filed by Kevin M. ONeil, Impala Transport. For the foregoing reasons, the court finds that Defendants have alleged diversity jurisdiction in good faith and have satisfied their burden at this time. If any of Plaintiff's members are in fact citizens of the same state as any of the Defendants, Plaintiff may of course bring a Motion to Dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 9/3/19. (jmr)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Second District Court Davis County, case number 190700626, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3346884) filed by Kevin M. ONeil, Impala Transport. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet - Amended Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint and Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit B - Summons on Return - Impala Transport, Inc., #4 Exhibit C - Summons on Return - Kevin O'Neil, #5 Exhibit D - Notice of Removal to Federal Court) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (Baxter, Stevan)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 8/14/2019. (ncw)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-The court orders Defendants, on or before August 28, 2019, to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to properly plead diversity jurisdiction. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 8/13/19. (jmr)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 File downloaded from Second District Court-Farmington. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 NEF, #3 Return of Service, #4 NEF, #5 Notice of Removal, #6 NEF) (jmr)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Great Western Leasing & Sales and Defendants Impala Transport, Kevin M. ONeil. (tlh)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Second District Court Davis County, case number 190700626, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3346884) filed by Kevin M. ONeil, Impala Transport. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint and Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit B - Summons on Return to Impala Transport, Inc., #4 Exhibit C - Notice of Removal to Federal Court) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (Baxter, Stevan)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Defendants Impala Transport and Kevin M. O'Neil are directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Western Leasing & Sales v. Impala Transport et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impala Transport
Represented By: Nathan D. Anderson
Represented By: Stevan R. Baxter
Represented By: John W. Greene
Represented By: Colleen L. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin M. ONeil
Represented By: Nathan D. Anderson
Represented By: Stevan R. Baxter
Represented By: John W. Greene
Represented By: Colleen L. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Western Leasing & Sales
Represented By: Aaron Hunter Smith
Represented By: Alan R. Houston
Represented By: Bradley W. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?