Sonohm Licensing v. Juniper Systems
Plaintiff: Sonohm Licensing
Defendant: Juniper Systems
Case Number: 1:2019cv00101
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Referring Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 20 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
October 24, 2019 Filing 19 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Sonohm Licensing. (nl)
October 16, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Sonohm Licensing filed by Juniper Systems.(Braithwaite, Jared)
October 16, 2019 Filing 17 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Juniper Systems. (las)
October 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Juniper Systems, Plaintiff Sonohm Licensing. Form due by 10/24/2019. (nl)
October 2, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Sonohm Licensing. (Swanson, Scott)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Juniper Systems answer due 10/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/01/2019. (nl)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Juniper Systems. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order ) Attorney Jared J. Braithwaite added to party Juniper Systems(pty:dft)(Braithwaite, Jared) Modified on 10/1/2019 to correct event to Motion for Extension of time to File Answer. (nl).
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonohm Licensing as to Juniper Systems served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (Swanson, Scott) Modified on 9/24/2019 to correct party being served(nl).
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #9 Affidavit of Service. The document Filed incorrectly. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading under summons returned executed. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket. (nl)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Related Cases by Sonohm Licensing (Swanson, Scott)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 ENTERED IN ERROR AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Summons served on Gary Spence on 9/11/2019, filed by Plaintiff Sonohm Licensing. (Swanson, Scott) Modified on 9/19/2019 stricken, filed under incorrect event. (nl).
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David R. Bennett for Sonohm Licensing. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/12/2019. No attached document. (nl)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David R. Bennett , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3370031, filed by Plaintiff Sonohm Licensing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Swanson, Scott)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Juniper Systems. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/03/2019. (nl)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (tlh)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney David R. Bennett, for Plaintiff Sonohm Licensing. (tlh)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Juniper Systems (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3362551) filed by Sonohm Licensing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Swanson, Scott)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff Sonohm Licensing is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonohm Licensing v. Juniper Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonohm Licensing
Represented By: Scott D. Swanson
Represented By: David R. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juniper Systems
Represented By: Jared J. Braithwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?