Mellies v. Skywalker Holdings
Plaintiff: Colby Mellies
Defendant: Skywalker Holdings
Case Number: 1:2019cv00105
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Plaintiff Colby Mellies, Defendant Skywalker Holdings. (nl)
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Colby Mellies. (nl)
November 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #8 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (nl)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Skywalker Holdings. (nl)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Skywalker Holdings answer due 11/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 11/11/2019. (nl)
October 31, 2019 Filing 9 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint filed by Defendant Skywalker Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevens, Liesel)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Colby Mellies, Defendant Skywalker Holdings. Form due by 11/4/2019. (nl)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 CLERKS ORDER of Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint re #2 Complaint signed by 10/09/2019. Answer deadline updated for Skywalker Holdings answer due 11/1/2019. (nl)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint Pursuant to DUCivR 77-2(a)(2) filed by Defendant Skywalker Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Liesel B. Stevens added to party Skywalker Holdings(pty:dft)(Stevens, Liesel)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Colby Mellies as to Skywalker Holdings served on 9/27/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint)(Anderson-West, Michele)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Skywalker Holdings. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 9/13/2019. (nl)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Skywalker Holdings (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3371370) filed by Colby Mellies. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Anderson-West, Michele)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Plaintiff Colby Mellies is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mellies v. Skywalker Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skywalker Holdings
Represented By: Liesel B. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colby Mellies
Represented By: Austin B. Egan
Represented By: Michele Anderson-West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?