Williams v. Ally Bank et al
Plaintiff: Kelly Williams
Defendant: Ally Bank and Jane Evans
Case Number: 1:2019cv00134
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Ally Bank answer due 2/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 1/14/2020. (nl)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 1/13/2020. (nl)
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, filed by Defendant Ally Bank. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney J. Derek Kearl added to party Ally Bank(pty:dft)(Kearl, J.)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT CERTIFICATE as to Jane Evans. (nl)
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Jane Evans and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Kelly Williams. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reay, Donald)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Williams as to Jane Evans served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Reay, Donald)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kelly Williams as to Ally Bank Waiver sent on 11/19/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Reay, Donald)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jane Evans. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Ally Bank. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 11/20/2019. (nl)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3424154) filed by Kelly Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 01, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (Reay, Donald)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Plaintiff Kelly Williams is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Ally Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Williams
Represented By: Donald S. Reay
Represented By: Justin D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Bank
Represented By: J. Derek Kearl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?