Utah Cornhole v. Edwards
Plaintiff: Utah Cornhole
Defendant: Gary Edwards
Case Number: 1:2020cv00009
Filed: January 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Gary Edwards answer due 4/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 3/3/2020. (nl)
March 2, 2020 Filing 6 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Summons Issued Electronically, filed by Plaintiff Utah Cornhole. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint)(Sam, Daniel)
February 6, 2020 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Utah Cornhole. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
January 30, 2020 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an action mailed to the Register of Copyrights Office. (tlh)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 1/29/2020. (nl)
January 29, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3473657) filed by Utah Cornhole. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-Game Changer Bag, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B-Bag Comparisons, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C-Website Text Comparison, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D-Infringing Text, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E-Utah Cornhole Registered Copyrights) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Sam, Daniel)
January 28, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiff Utah Cornhole is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Utah Cornhole v. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utah Cornhole
Represented By: Daniel S. Sam
Represented By: Ryan D. Sam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?