Elevate Federal Credit Union v. Elevations Credit Union
Plaintiff: Elevate Federal Credit Union
Defendant: Elevations Credit Union
Case Number: 1:2020cv00028
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dale A Kimball
Referring Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Elevate Federal Credit Union as to Elevations Credit Union Waiver sent on 4/3/2020, answer due 6/2/2020. (Deforge, Nicole)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to Defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 3/9/2020. (eat)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 3/5/2020. (eat)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (tlh)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Elevations Credit Union (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3513038) filed by Elevate Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Certificates of Trademarks, #3 Exhibit B - 137 Registration, #4 Exhibit C - Trademark Search System, #5 Exhibit D - Trademark Search, #6 Exhibit E - Trademark Search, #7 Exhibit F - Trademark Search) Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball (Deforge, Nicole)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Plaintiff Elevate Federal Credit Union is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elevate Federal Credit Union v. Elevations Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elevations Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elevate Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Matthew S. Brahana
Represented By: Kirsten R. Allen
Represented By: Nicole Miller Deforge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?