Abernathy v. Molina Healthcare
Plaintiff: Cindy Abernathy
Defendant: Molina Healthcare
Case Number: 1:2020cv00042
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Referring Judge: Dale A Kimball
2 Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF FILING of Consent to Join Collective Action filed by Plaintiff Cindy Abernathy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent Form)(Fundora Rodriguez, Camille)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 6/8/2020. (eat)
June 5, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF ADR e-mailed to Plaintiff Cindy Abernathy, and to Defendant Molina Healthcare. (eat)
June 5, 2020 Filing 32 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
June 5, 2020 Filing 31 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Cindy Abernathy. (alf)
June 3, 2020 Filing 30 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Molina Healthcare. (alf)
June 3, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #18 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (alf)
June 2, 2020 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Molina Healthcare. (Orr, Cheryl)
June 2, 2020 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Molina Healthcare.(Orr, Cheryl)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kristin M. Halsing for Molina Healthcare.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/28/20. (alf)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Katrina W. Forsyth for Molina Healthcare.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/28/20. (alf)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Cheryl D. Orr for Molina Healthcare.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/28/20. (alf)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Gregory P. Abrams for Molina Healthcare.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/28/20. (alf)
May 27, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kristin M. Halsing , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3588288,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Molina Healthcare. (Attachments: #1 Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 [Proposed] Order)(Zender, Jill)
May 27, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Katrina W. Forsyth , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3588282,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Molina Healthcare. (Attachments: #1 Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 [Proposed] Order)(Zender, Jill)
May 27, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gregory P. Abrams , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3588268,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Molina Healthcare. (Attachments: #1 Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 [Proposed] Order)(Zender, Jill)
May 27, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Cheryl D. Orr , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3588213,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Molina Healthcare. (Attachments: #1 Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 [Proposed] Order)(Zender, Jill)
May 18, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Cindy Abernathy, Defendant Molina Healthcare. Form due by 6/2/2020. (alf)
May 18, 2020 Filing 17 CLERKS ORDER re #16 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, signed by Anne Morgan, Chief Deputy. Answer deadline updated for Molina Healthcare to 6/2/2020. (alf)
May 15, 2020 Filing 16 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, filed by Defendant Molina Healthcare. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Jill A Zender added to party Molina Healthcare(pty:dft)(Zender, Jill)
April 29, 2020 Filing 15 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cindy Abernathy as to Molina Healthcare served on 4/28/2020, answer due 5/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Court Issued Summons)(Rodriguez, Camille)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Sarah Schalman-Bergen for Cindy Abernathy.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 4/29/2020. (nl)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Krysten L. Connon for Cindy Abernathy.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 4/29/2020. (nl)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Camille Fundora Rodriguez for Cindy Abernathy.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 4/29/2020. (nl)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Anastasia Doherty for Cindy Abernathy.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 4/29/2020. (nl)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Harold L. Lichten for Cindy Abernathy.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 4/29/2020. (nl)
April 28, 2020 Filing 9 Plaintiff's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sarah Schalman-Bergen , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3559856,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Cindy Abernathy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PHV Application of Sarah Schalman-Bergen, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(Peck, Elizabeth)
April 28, 2020 Filing 8 Plaintiff's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Krysten L. Connon , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3559851,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Cindy Abernathy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PHV Application of Krysten L. Connon, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(Peck, Elizabeth)
April 28, 2020 Filing 7 Plaintiff's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Camille Fundora Rodriguez , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3559825,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Cindy Abernathy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PHV Application of Camille Fundora Rodriguez, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(Peck, Elizabeth)
April 28, 2020 Filing 6 Plaintiff's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anastasia Doherty , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3559819,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Cindy Abernathy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PHV Application of Anastasia Doherty, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Peck, Elizabeth)
April 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Harold L. Lichten , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3559797,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Cindy Abernathy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PHV Application of Harold L. Lichten, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(Peck, Elizabeth)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Molina Healthcare. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within twenty-one (21) days after any defendant has appeared or after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 4/24/2020. (nl)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT (Collective Action) against Molina Healthcare (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3555232) filed by Cindy Abernathy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Peck, Elizabeth)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff Cindy Abernathy is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (jl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abernathy v. Molina Healthcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molina Healthcare
Represented By: Kristin M. Halsing
Represented By: Gregory P. Abrams
Represented By: Cheryl D. Orr
Represented By: Katrina W. Forsyth
Represented By: Jill A Zender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Abernathy
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Peck
Represented By: Sarah Rebecca Schalman-Bergen
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Represented By: Anastasia Doherty
Represented By: Krysten Leigh Connon
Represented By: Camille Fundora Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?