Bates v. Cache County School District et al
Plaintiff: Jackie Bates
Defendant: Joel Allred, Cache County School District, Cache County School Board and John Anderson
Case Number: 1:2020cv00055
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Referring Judge: Jill N Parrish
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/18/2021. Motions due by 7/16/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/2021 at 02:00 PM in Rm 8.200 before Judge Jill N. Parrish. See order for additional deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 6/29/2020. (nl)
June 26, 2020 Filing 26 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Bearnson, Bradley)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Joel Allred answer due 7/16/2020; John Anderson answer due 7/16/2020; Cache County School Board answer due 7/16/2020; Cache County School District answer due 7/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 6/11/2020. (nl)
June 10, 2020 Filing 24 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Joel Allred, John Anderson, Cache County School Board, Cache County School District. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Terry, Rachel)
June 8, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Fay Bradley on behalf of Joel Allred, John Anderson, Cache County School Board, Cache County School District (Bradley, Diana)
June 5, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Acknowledgment by Joel Allred, John Anderson, Cache County School Board, Cache County School District re #14 Civil Standing Order (Terry, Rachel)
June 4, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order filed by Plaintiff Jackie Bates (Bergman, Aaron)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Cache County School Board answer due 7/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 5/27/2020. (nl)
May 26, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Joel Allred, John Anderson, Cache County School Board, Cache County School District. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg. Attorney Rachel G. Terry added to party Cache County School District(pty:dft)(Terry, Rachel)
May 21, 2020 Filing 18 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jackie Bates as to Cache County School Board served on 5/21/2020, answer due 6/11/2020. (Bergman, Aaron)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 5/20/2020. (nl)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Joel Allred answer due 6/10/2020; John Anderson answer due 6/11/2020; Cache County School Board answer due 6/11/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 5/20/2020. (nl)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 5/19/20. (ss)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 5/19/20. (ss)
May 14, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Joel Allred, John Anderson, Cache County School Board. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Rachel G. Terry added to party Joel Allred(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel G. Terry added to party John Anderson(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel G. Terry added to party Cache County School Board(pty:dft)(Terry, Rachel)
May 14, 2020 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jackie Bates (Bergman, Aaron)
May 14, 2020 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jackie Bates (Bergman, Aaron)
May 14, 2020 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Cache County School Board. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
May 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #8 Summons Returned Executed and #7 Summons Returned Executed. The document Summons Returned Executed had incorrect documents uploaded. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleadings as Summons Returned Executed. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket. (nl)
May 7, 2020 Filing 8 STRICKEN-DISREGARD **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jackie Bates as to John Anderson served on 5/7/2020, answer due 5/28/2020. (Bergman, Aaron) Modified on 5/14/2020strickent, incorrect documents uploaded, parties to disregard (nl).
May 7, 2020 Filing 7 STRICKEN-DISREGARD **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jackie Bates as to Cache County School District served on 5/7/2020, answer due 5/28/2020. (Bergman, Aaron) Modified on 5/14/2020 stricken, incorrect documents uploaded parties to disregard(nl).
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jackie Bates as to Joel Allred served on 5/6/2020, answer due 5/27/2020. (Bergman, Aaron)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Cache County School District. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to John Anderson. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Joel Allred. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3567612) filed by Jackie Bates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (Bergman, Aaron)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiff Jackie Bates is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (jl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bates v. Cache County School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Allred
Represented By: Rachel G. Terry
Represented By: Diana Fay Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cache County School District
Represented By: Rachel G. Terry
Represented By: Diana Fay Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cache County School Board
Represented By: Rachel G. Terry
Represented By: Diana Fay Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Anderson
Represented By: Rachel G. Terry
Represented By: Diana Fay Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Bates
Represented By: Aaron K. Bergman
Represented By: Bradley H. Bearnson
Represented By: Wayne K. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?