Jensen v. Howmedica Osteonics et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Jensen
Defendant: Osartis GMBH, AAP Biomaterials GMHB and Howmedica Osteonics doing business as Stryker Orthopaedics
Case Number: 1:2020cv00084
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Howmedica Osteonics. Attorney Brent O. Hatch added to party Howmedica Osteonics(pty:dft)(Hatch, Brent)
July 28, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. DeGreeff on behalf of Lisa Jensen (DeGreeff, David)
July 28, 2020 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Personal Service served on Holli Tharp on 7/22/2020, filed by Plaintiff Lisa Jensen. (Callahan, Luke)
July 28, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Luke F. Callahan on behalf of Lisa Jensen (Callahan, Luke)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Luke F. Callahan for Lisa Jensen.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/23/2020. (lnp)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David C. DeGreeff for Lisa Jensen.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/23/2020. (lnp)
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Luke F. Callahan , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3657646,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Lisa Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Barton, Eric)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David C. DeGreeff , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3657635,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Lisa Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Barton, Eric)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a discovery schedule to defendant(s) in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within twenty-one (21) days after any defendant has been served or any defendant has appeared, unless any party is appearing pro se. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/15/2020. (lnp)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 7/14/2020. (lnp)
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Howmedica Osteonics. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kn)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Osartis GMBH. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kn)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 Remark: Case originally assigned 1:20-cv-492-HCN, has now been reassigned to 1:20-cv-84-HCN. Please use new case number of pleadings. (nl)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3644744) filed by Lisa Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (Barton, Eric)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Plaintiff Lisa Jensen is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (kn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jensen v. Howmedica Osteonics et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osartis GMBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AAP Biomaterials GMHB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics doing business as Stryker Orthopaedics
Represented By: Brent O. Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Jensen
Represented By: Eric D. Barton
Represented By: Luke F. Callahan
Represented By: David C. DeGreeff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?