Roark v. Menzies Aviation
Plaintiff: Lynn Roark
Defendant: Menzies Aviation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00097
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/13/2021. Motions due by 10/11/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. See order for other dates and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/29/20. (alf)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Patrick Joseph McMahon for Menzies Aviation.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/29/20. (alf)
September 28, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Patrick Joseph McMahon , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3734917,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Menzies Aviation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 14 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Emery, Dawn)
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Defendant Menzies Aviation, Plaintiff Lynn Roark. (alf)
August 28, 2020 Filing 12 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Lynn Roark. (alf)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Menzies Aviation. (alf)
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Menzies Aviation.(O'Brien, Michael)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christopher G. Ward for Menzies Aviation.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 8/27/20. (alf)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Menzies Aviation, Plaintiff Lynn Roark. Form due by 9/11/2020. (alf)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher G. Ward , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3697224,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Menzies Aviation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)(O'Brien, Michael)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. O'Brien on behalf of Menzies Aviation (O'Brien, Michael)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynn Roark as to Menzies Aviation served on 8/6/2020, answer due 8/27/2020. (Haymore, Jason)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 8/5/20. (alf)
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Menzies Aviation. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kn)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3671417) filed by Lynn Roark. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (Emery, Dawn)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Plaintiff Lynn Roark is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (kn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roark v. Menzies Aviation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menzies Aviation
Represented By: Christopher G. Ward
Represented By: Michael P. O'Brien
Represented By: Patrick Joseph McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Roark
Represented By: Jason D. Haymore
Represented By: Dawn W. Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?