American Agencies v. Sloan
Plaintiff: American Agencies
Defendant: Brent Sloan
Case Number: 1:2020cv00127
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Civil Case Terminated per #9 plaintiff's motion to dismiss. Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg and Judge Jill N. Parrish no longer assigned to case (jl)
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 Plaintiff's MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Plaintiff American Agencies. (Erickson, Michael)
October 29, 2020 Filing 8 Remark: The court has reviewed American Agencies' Response to Order to Show Cause and determines that American Agencies has adequately alleged facts establishing a prima facie case for diversity jurisdiction. (ksb)
October 29, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by American Agencies. (Erickson, Michael)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- the court ORDERS American Agencies to list its members and to allege the domicile of each member. American Agencies must also allege the domicile of Brent Sloan on the date that the complaint was filed. American Agencies must file a response to this order by October 30, 2020. If American Agencies does not respond, the court will dismiss this case. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/14/2020. (nl)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 9/30/2020. (nl)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/29/20. (ss)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/29/20. (ss)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Brent Sloan (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3735730) filed by American Agencies. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (Erickson, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiff American Agencies is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Agencies v. Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Agencies
Represented By: Michael K. Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?