Buttars et al v. Odell Law et al
Plaintiff: Durbano Law Firm and Natalie Buttars
Defendant: Odell Law and Robert Odell
Case Number: 1:2021cv00001
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Durbano Law Firm, Natalie Buttars as to Robert Odell served on 1/20/2021, answer due 2/10/2021., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Durbano Law Firm; Natalie Buttars re #6 Summons Returned Executed,, Return of Service, (Keiter, John)
January 22, 2021 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Durbano Law Firm, Natalie Buttars as to Odell Law served on 1/20/2021, answer due 2/10/2021., **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Personal served on Natalie(Robert ODell's Assistant) on 01/20/2021, filed by Defendant Odell Law. (Keiter, John)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 1/14/21. (alf)
January 5, 2021 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Robert Odell. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
January 5, 2021 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Odell Law. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
January 5, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 6230666 BUTDC-3862098) filed by Durbano Law Firm, Natalie Buttars. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Keiter, John) Modified on 1/5/2021 to correct receipt number (dw).
January 5, 2021 Modification of Docket: Error: Counsel emailed initiating complaint 01/04/2021 but did not e-file nor pay until 01/05/2021. Correction: Changed filing date and fee date to 01/05/2021. The date the complaint was e-filed and paid. re #2 Complaint. (dw)
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Plaintiffs Natalie Buttars and Durbano Law Firm are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buttars et al v. Odell Law et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Durbano Law Firm
Represented By: John E. Keiter, Jr.
Represented By: Douglas M Durbano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Buttars
Represented By: John E. Keiter, Jr.
Represented By: Douglas M Durbano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Odell Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Odell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?