Mulder v. Saul
Plaintiff: Amy Lee Mulder
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Not Classified By Court: SSA Notice
Case Number: 1:2021cv00044
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Plaintiff Amy Lee Mulder, Defendant Andrew Saul. (alf)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Andrew Saul. (alf)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Amy Lee Mulder. (alf)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Amy Lee Mulder, Defendant Andrew Saul. Form due by 4/30/2021. (alf)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda A. Berndt on behalf of Andrew Saul (Berndt, Amanda)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Attorney's Office. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Attorney General. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul (Originally received by the court on 04/01/2021). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Amy Lee Mulder. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (nmt)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 04/05/2021. (nmt)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 04/01/2021) filed by Plaintiff Amy Lee Mulder. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mulder v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Amanda A. Berndt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Lee Mulder
Represented By: Landon J. Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA Notice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?