Reyes v. Fowlkes et al
Plaintiff: Freddy Joe Reyes
Defendant: Utah Department of Natural Resources Parks and Recreation, Mike Fowlks, Mercer Owen, James Morgan, Chase Pill and Chase Pili
Case Number: 1:2021cv00061
Filed: April 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Filing 18 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Defendants Mike Fowlks, James Morgan, Mercer Owen, Chase Pili, Plaintiff Freddy Joe Reyes. (alf)
June 7, 2021 Filing 17 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Mike Fowlks, James Morgan, Mercer Owen, Chase Pili. (alf)
June 3, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #11 Affidavit of Service. The document is stricken as improperly filed. Document should be filed as a Waiver of Service. It appears to be a duplicate of document #12 - if this is the case it does not need to be refiled. If not, the clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket. (alf)
June 3, 2021 Filing 15 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Freddy Joe Reyes. (alf)
June 3, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Mike Fowlks, James Morgan, Mercer Owen, Chase Pili, Plaintiff Freddy Joe Reyes. Form due by 6/18/2021. (alf)
June 2, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa R. Walsh on behalf of Mike Fowlks, James Morgan, Mercer Owen, Chase Pili (Walsh, Vanessa)
June 2, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Freddy Joe Reyes as to All Defendants. (Richards, Randall)
June 2, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Amended Complaint and Jury demand served on Vanessa Walsh on 06/02/2021, filed by Plaintiff Freddy Joe Reyes. (Richards, Randall) Modified on 6/3/2021 - stricken as improperly filed (alf).
June 2, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. New Defendants: Chase Pili. Removed Defendants: Chase Pill, Utah Department of Natural Resources Parks and Recreation. filed by Freddy Joe Reyes. (Richards, Randall)
May 13, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Removed Defendants: Department of Natural Resources. filed by Freddy Joe Reyes. (Richards, Randall)
May 5, 2021 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Chase Pill. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
May 5, 2021 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Mercer Owen. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
May 5, 2021 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to James Morgan. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
May 5, 2021 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Mike Fowlks. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
May 5, 2021 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Utah Department of Natural Resources Parks and Recreation. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 4/28/21. (alf)
April 27, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-3990785) filed by Freddy Joe Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (Richards, Randall)
April 27, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Plaintiff Freddy Joe Reyes is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes v. Fowlkes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah Department of Natural Resources Parks and Recreation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Fowlks
Represented By: Vanessa R. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercer Owen
Represented By: Vanessa R. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Morgan
Represented By: Vanessa R. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Pill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Pili
Represented By: Vanessa R. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddy Joe Reyes
Represented By: Randall W Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?