Herrera v. Johnson
Plaintiff: Daniel Herrera
Defendant: Brent M. Johnson
Not Classified By Court: Correction Section (FYI) and Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 1:2021cv00089
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Though the Court already granted plaintiffs application to proceed in forma pauperis, Plaintiff must still eventually pay $350.00, the full amount of the filing fee. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $0.02 within thirty days of the date of this Order, or the complaint will be dismissed. Plaintiff must make monthly payments of twenty percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiffs account. See order for details. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 08/09/2021. (kpf)
July 29, 2021 Filing 13 **SEALED DOCUMENT**Certificate regarding inmate account and statement filed by Plaintiff Daniel Herrera. (kpf) Modified on to correct filing date 7/30/2021 (kpf).
July 29, 2021 Filing 12 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Letter to the Clerk of Court re: Motion of Extension of time, previously filed;. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (kpf)
July 19, 2021 Filing 11 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Letter to the Clerk of Court. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (kpf)
July 19, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time (15 days) to file documents filed by Plaintiff Daniel Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Letter re: Inmate Account, #2 Letter Re: Trust Fund Account, #3 Consent in case 4:21cv74, #4 Envelope)(kpf)
July 6, 2021 Filing 9 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Letter to the Court. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
July 6, 2021 Filing 8 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Letter to the Court. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
June 17, 2021 Filing 7 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of GRAMA Records Request Form. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (mh)
June 17, 2021 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Brent M. Johnson (Originally received by the court on 06/14/2021). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Daniel Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Impecuniosity, #2 Exhibit Letter to Brent M Johnson, #3 Exhibit Letter to Governor Cox, #4 Exhibit Letter to Clerk of the Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #6 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge Tena Campbell (mh)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Service of Process ; granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: TBD. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to file with the Court a certified copy of his inmate trust account statements. If Plaintiff does not fully comply, his complaint will be dismissed. Collection of Fees Sent: No Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 06/16/2021. (mh)
June 16, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Service of Process. filed by Plaintiff Daniel Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Motion for Service of Process)(mh)
June 14, 2021 Filing 3 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Complaint, Motion and Proposed Order for Service of Process, Affidavit of Impecuniosity, GRAMA Request, Letter to Governor Cox, Letter to Brent M Johnson, Letter to Clerk of Court, Civil Cover Sheet and Envelopes. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Motion for Service of Process, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Service of Process, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Impecuniosity, #4 Affidavit GRAMA Request, #5 Exhibit Letter to Governor Cox, #6 Exhibit Letter to Brent M Johnson, #7 Exhibit Letter to Clerk of Court, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Envelope)(mh)
June 14, 2021 Filing 2 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Daniel Herrera received from Correctional Institution. (mh)
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 06/14/2021) filed by Plaintiff Daniel Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Waive Fees)(mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrera v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?