Seamster v. USA
Petitioner: Allen Wayne Seamster
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2021cv00093
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Acknowledgement of Waiver of Attorney Client Privilege. The Motion for Discovery is Granted in Part and Denied in Part. The Motion for Extension of Time to Respond is Denied in part and Granted in Part. The court Grants 30 days from the date of this order to respond to Petitioner's Motion. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 07/21/2021. (kpf)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by USA re #3 MOTION for (1) Acknowledgement of Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege, (2) Discovery, and (3) Extension of Time to Respond re #2 Order to Respond (2255), #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), (McFarland, Victoria)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for (1) Acknowledgement of Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege, (2) Discovery, and (3) Extension of Time to Respond re #2 Order to Respond (2255), #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Respondent USA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McFarland, Victoria)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO RESPOND AND REPLY - USA must respond to #1 Petitioner's 28 U.S.C. 2255 Motion to Vacate within Thirty Days days of this order. The court Orders Petitioner to submit a reply, if any, to the United States Attorney's response within thirty days of the date of the response. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 06/24/2021. (kpf)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255). Related case: 1:20-cr-0015-DBB-1. No filing fee required. AUSA added to the case: Yes. filed by Allen Wayne Seamster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) Assigned to Judge David Barlow (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seamster v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Allen Wayne Seamster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Victoria K. McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?