Bethke v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Barbara Bethke
Defendant: Andrew Saul and Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: SSA Notice
Case Number: 1:2021cv00094
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barbara Bethke. Kilolo Kijakazi served on 8/12/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Vanderwerff, Adam)
August 10, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 21 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Barbara Bethke. Form due by 8/31/2021. (alf)
August 9, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda A. Berndt on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Berndt, Amanda)
August 3, 2021 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Regional Chief Counsel Social Security Administration. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
August 3, 2021 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Attorney General. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
August 3, 2021 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to US Attorney District of Utah. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Adam A. Vanderwerff for Barbara Bethke.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 07/30/2021. (jl)
July 27, 2021 Filing 6 First MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Adam Vanderwerff , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4067280,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Barbara Bethke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit application PHV)(Ban, Joel)
July 26, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 4681095278) filed by Barbara Bethke. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (mh)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE FROM THE COURT: Kilolo Kijakazi became the Acting Commissioner of Social Security on July 9, 2021. Pursuant to Rule 25(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the last sentence of section 205(g) of the Social Security Act, 42 U.S.C. 405(g), Kilolo Kijakazi is substituted for Andrew Saul as the defendant in this suit. (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 06/30/2021. (mh)
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mh)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 06/30/2021) filed by Plaintiff Barbara Bethke. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bethke v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Amanda A. Berndt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Notice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Bethke
Represented By: Joel M. Ban
Represented By: Adam A. Vanderwerff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?