Crookston v. USA
Plaintiff: Julianne Crookston
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2021cv00102
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Referring Judge: Jill N Parrish
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2410
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julianne Crookston. USA served on 7/28/2021, answer due 9/27/2021. (Meziani, Sam)
July 27, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #3 filed by Plaintiff Julianne Crookston (Meziani, Sam)
July 27, 2021 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to USA. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report, available on the District of Utah's website at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/civil-case-scheduling, within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 07/26/2021. (jl)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/22/21. (ss)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/22/21. (ss)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4062324) filed by Julianne Crookston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Federal Liens, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (Meziani, Sam)
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiff Julianne Crookston is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crookston v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julianne Crookston
Represented By: Sam Meziani
Represented By: Samantha E. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?