Summit Mountain Holding Group v. Summit Village Development Lender 1 et al
Plaintiff: Summit Mountain Holding Group
Defendant: Summit Village Development Lender 1 and Grand Canyon Development Holdings 3
Case Number: 1:2021cv00110
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Referring Judge: Bruce S Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTIONS VIA ZOOM re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss; #17 MOTION for Judicial Notice; and #18 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. the parties should not appear in person at the courthouse. The Zoom participation information is as follows: Join ZoomGov Meetinghttps://www.zoomgov.com/j/1615667901?pwd=TUdmNUVmL0lXK2lrcmpjWHQwa3M4QT09Meeting ID: 161 566 7901Passcode: 230057One tap mobile+16692545252,,1615667901#,,,,*230057# US (San Jose)+16692161590,,1615667901#,,,,*230057# US (San Jose)Dial by your location +1 669 254 5252 US (San Jose) +1 669 216 1590 US (San Jose) +1 646 828 7666 US (New York) +1 551 285 1373 USMeeting ID: 161 566 7901Passcode: 230057Find your local number: https://www.zoomgov.com/u/aev7IWppZe (kms)
September 23, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support *Hearing Requested* filed by Plaintiff Summit Mountain Holding Group. (Young, Spencer)
September 23, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION for Judicial Notice re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Summit Mountain Holding Group. (Young, Spencer)
September 23, 2021 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support *Hearing Requested* filed by Plaintiff Summit Mountain Holding Group. (Young, Spencer)
September 16, 2021 Filing 19 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time Time to Propose Schedule to Defendants and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Summit Mountain Holding Group. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time to Propose Schedule)(Young, Spencer)
August 26, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Grand Canyon Development Holdings 3. (Milne, Eli)
August 26, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Judicial Notice re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Grand Canyon Development Holdings 3, Summit Village Development Lender 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Default)(Milne, Eli)
August 26, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Summit Village Development Lender 1. (Milne, Eli)
August 18, 2021 Filing 15 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
August 17, 2021 Filing 14 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Summit Mountain Holding Group. (alf)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jess R. Bressi for Grand Canyon Development Holdings 3 and Summit Village Development Lender 1.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 8/11/21. (alf)
August 10, 2021 Filing 12 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Grand Canyon Development Holdings 3, Summit Village Development Lender 1. (alf)
August 10, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jess R. Bressi , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4078494,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Grand Canyon Development Holdings 3, Summit Village Development Lender 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Milne, Eli)
August 10, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Grand Canyon Development Holdings 3, Summit Village Development Lender 1, Plaintiff Summit Mountain Holding Group. Form due by 8/25/2021. (alf)
August 10, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Eli Milne on behalf of Grand Canyon Development Holdings 3, Summit Village Development Lender 1 (Milne, Eli)
August 10, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by H. Burt Ringwood on behalf of Summit Mountain Holding Group (Ringwood, H.)
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by Summit Mountain Holding Group.Grand Canyon Development Holdings 3 served on 8/9/2021, answer due 8/30/2021; Summit Village Development Lender 1 served on 8/9/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (Young, Spencer)
August 5, 2021 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Summit Village Development Lender 1. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Grand Canyon Development Holdings 3. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
August 5, 2021 Filing 4 ERRATA to #2 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Summit Mountain Holding Group - Civil Cover Sheet. (Young, Spencer)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 8/5/21. (alf)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BUTDC-4074346) filed by Summit Mountain Holding Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Young, Spencer)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Plaintiff Summit Mountain Holding Group is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summit Mountain Holding Group v. Summit Village Development Lender 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit Mountain Holding Group
Represented By: William B. Ingram
Represented By: Spencer W. Young
Represented By: H. Burt Ringwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Village Development Lender 1
Represented By: Eli Milne
Represented By: Jess R. Bressi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Canyon Development Holdings 3
Represented By: Eli Milne
Represented By: Jess R. Bressi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?