Abreu v. Davis County et al
Plaintiff: Angel Christopher Abreu
Defendant: Davis County and Davis County Jail
Not Classified By Court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 1:2021cv00129
Filed: September 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Full Filing fee: $ 402.00 received, receipt number 4681096167. (mh)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Davis County, Davis County Jail (Originally received by the court on 09/14/2021). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Angel Christopher Abreu. (Attachments: #1 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (nmt)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: TBD. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to file with the Court a certified copy of his inmate trust account statements. Collection of Fees Sent: No Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 09/15/2021. (nmt)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Angel Christopher Abreu. (nmt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2021: #1 Re-Scanned for OCR) (am).
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Complaint, Motion for Counsel, Envelope. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, #2 Envelope)(nmt)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 09/14/2021) filed by Plaintiff Angel Christopher Abreu. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abreu v. Davis County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Christopher Abreu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?