Niehues et al v. Whitemyer et al
Plaintiff: James Niehues, James Niehues LLC and Open Road Ski Company
Defendant: Rick Whitemyer individually and doing business as Gnarwalls, Amberlee Whitemyer individually and doing business as Gnarwalls and Buzz Graphics doing business as Gnarwalls
Case Number: 1:2021cv00134
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STATUS REPORT ORDER. On 10/22/2021, Plaintiffs filed a proof of service for each Defendant indicating that each Defendant was served with a summons and the complaint on 10/18/2021. As of the date of this order, none of the Defendants has filed a timely response to Plaintiffs' complaint, and Plaintiffs have taken no action to move this case forward. Accordingly, Plaintiffs are hereby ordered to file a status report with the court on or before 12/14/2021 indicating the status of this case and their intentions to proceed. Status Report due by 12/14/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 11/30/2021. (docket text order; no attached document) (jcd)
October 22, 2021 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Niehues, James Niehues LLC, Open Road Ski Company as to Buzz Graphics served on 10/18/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Chandler, Deborah)
October 22, 2021 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Niehues, James Niehues LLC, Open Road Ski Company as to Rick Whitemyer served on 10/18/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Chandler, Deborah)
October 22, 2021 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Niehues, James Niehues LLC, Open Road Ski Company as to Amberlee Whitemyer served on 10/18/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Chandler, Deborah)
October 8, 2021 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Rick Whitemyer. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
October 8, 2021 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Buzz Graphics. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
October 8, 2021 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Amberlee Whitemyer. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 10/6/21. (alf)
October 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney MJ Bogatin, for Plaintiffs James Niehues LLC, James Niehues, Open Road Ski Company (nmt)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action mailed to the Register of Copyrights Office. (nmt)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against Buzz Graphics, Amberlee Whitemyer, Rick Whitemyer (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4131014) filed by James Niehues, James Niehues LLC, Open Road Ski Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Chandler, Deborah)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Plaintiffs James Niehues LLC, James Niehues, Open Road Ski Company is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Niehues et al v. Whitemyer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Niehues
Represented By: Deborah Chandler
Represented By: Jason E. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Niehues LLC
Represented By: Deborah Chandler
Represented By: Jason E. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Open Road Ski Company
Represented By: Deborah Chandler
Represented By: Jason E. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Whitemyer individually and doing business as Gnarwalls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amberlee Whitemyer individually and doing business as Gnarwalls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buzz Graphics doing business as Gnarwalls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?