Lifetime Products v. Logan Outdoor Products
Plaintiff: Lifetime Products
Defendant: Logan Outdoor Products a Utah Limited Liability Company doing business as Camp Chef
Case Number: 1:2021cv00156
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Referring Judge: Daphne A Oberg
2 Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 0183
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2022 Filing 23 Supplemental MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher J. Pulido , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4219140,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Logan Outdoor Products. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hancock, Cameron)
January 13, 2022 Filing 22 Supplemental MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David T. Pollock , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4219089,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Logan Outdoor Products. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hancock, Cameron)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DOCKET TEXT ORDER: Defendant is ordered to supplement its #19 , #20 Motions for Pro Hac Vice Admission with the information required by to DUCivR 83-1.1(c) within seven days of this order. Defendant may supplement its motions utilizing the new motion form found on the court's website. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 1/13/2022. (eh)
January 12, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher J. Pulido , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4219140,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Logan Outdoor Products. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Application of Christopher Pulido for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hancock, Cameron)
January 12, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David T. Pollock , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4219089,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Logan Outdoor Products. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Application of David Pollock for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hancock, Cameron)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr on 1/6/21. (dla)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF RECUSAL - Judge Dale A. Kimball recused. Case reassigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 1/5/2022. (eat)
January 4, 2022 Filing 16 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
January 4, 2022 Filing 15 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Lifetime Products. (alf)
January 3, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #10 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (alf)
December 24, 2021 Filing 13 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Logan Outdoor Products. (mh)
December 13, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James T. Burton on behalf of Logan Outdoor Products (Burton, James)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint/Submit Attorney Planning Meeting Report. Report due 1/10/2022. Answer deadline updated for Logan Outdoor Products to 1/17/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/10/21. (alf)
December 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Lifetime Products, Defendant Logan Outdoor Products. Form due by 12/27/2021. (alf)
December 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron M. Hancock on behalf of Logan Outdoor Products (Hancock, Cameron)
December 9, 2021 Filing 8 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time (a) Extend Deadlines Set Forth in Order to Propose Schedule and (b) Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint filed by Defendant Logan Outdoor Products. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Rupp, Joshua) Modified on 12/10/2021 to correct event type that will allow setting of answer deadline (alf).
December 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua S. Rupp on behalf of Logan Outdoor Products (Rupp, Joshua)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/30/21. (dla)
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lifetime Products as to Logan Outdoor Products served on 11/19/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. (Harris, Kirk)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Logan Outdoor Products. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (mh)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Logan Outdoor Products (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4169298) filed by Lifetime Products. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-US PAT 10,292,531, #2 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Harris, Kirk)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff Lifetime Products is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lifetime Products v. Logan Outdoor Products
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lifetime Products
Represented By: Sterling Arthur Brennan
Represented By: Kirk R. Harris
Represented By: Ryan A. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan Outdoor Products a Utah Limited Liability Company doing business as Camp Chef
Represented By: Cameron M. Hancock
Represented By: James T. Burton
Represented By: Joshua S. Rupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?