Medford v. Management & Training
Plaintiff: Martina Medford
Defendant: Management & Training
Case Number: 1:2022cv00056
Filed: April 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Veronica T. Hunter for Management & Training.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/26/22. (dla)
May 25, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Veronica T. Hunter , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4342885,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Management & Training. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission (Veronica T. Hunter), #2 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Burt, Jonathan)
May 25, 2022 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Management & Training. (Burt, Jonathan)
May 25, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Management & Training.(Burt, Jonathan)
May 10, 2022 Filing 13 CLERKS ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time Respond to Complaint. (dla)
May 10, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Management & Training. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Burt, Jonathan)
May 10, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Burt on behalf of Management & Training (Burt, Jonathan)
May 2, 2022 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martina Medford as to Management & Training served on 4/20/2022, answer due 5/11/2022. (Foty, Don)
April 20, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Consents to Join Wage Claim by Martina Medford Pursuant to 29 USC 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms) (Foty, Don)
April 19, 2022 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Management & Training. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Don J. Foty for Martina Medford.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 4/18/22.c (dla)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING MOTION #3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Donny J. Foty , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4301682,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case a filed by Martina Medford. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr., on 4/11/2022. (mlp)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr on 4/11/22. (dla)
April 8, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Don J. Foty, for Plaintiff Martina Medford. (mh)
April 8, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Donny J. Foty , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4301682,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Martina Medford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Exhibit Cert. Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Harstad, Kathryn)
April 8, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4301651) filed by Martina Medford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (Harstad, Kathryn)
April 8, 2022 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Plaintiff Martina Medford is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medford v. Management & Training
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martina Medford
Represented By: Kathryn K. Harstad
Represented By: Don J. Foty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Management & Training
Represented By: Jonathan M. Burt
Represented By: Veronica T. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?