Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse v. Newgate Mall Other Equities
Plaintiff: Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse
Defendant: Newgate Mall Other Equities
Case Number: 1:2022cv00157
Filed: November 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2022 Civil Case Terminated per notice #10 . (alf)
December 9, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse (Pratt, George)
December 6, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form and place Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Please do not e-file the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse, Defendant Newgate Mall Other Equities. Form due by 12/27/2022. (alf)
December 6, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse, Defendant Newgate Mall Other Equities. (alf)
December 6, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Ford on behalf of Newgate Mall Other Equities (Ford, Michael)
December 6, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. Janicki on behalf of Newgate Mall Other Equities (Janicki, Robert)
November 29, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse as to Newgate Mall Other Equities served on 11/16/2022, answer due 12/7/2022. (Pratt, George)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 11/16/2022. (alf)
November 16, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Newgate Mall Other Equities. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
November 15, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Newgate Mall Other Equities (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4505862) filed by Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Pratt, George)
November 15, 2022 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Plaintiff Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402. by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse v. Newgate Mall Other Equities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse
Represented By: George W. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newgate Mall Other Equities
Represented By: Michael L. Ford
Represented By: Robert L. Janicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?