Owner-Operator Ind, et al v. CR England
Plaintiff: James Murphy, Owner-Operator Independent Drivers Association, William Piper and Don Sullivan, Sr.
Defendant: C.R. England
Case Number: 2:2002cv00950
Filed: January 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Interstate Commerce Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 555 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 542 Defendants Objections to the Magistrate Judges Decisions in Damages Analysis and Motion to Reconsider Rulings on Maintenance Expenses in the Other Account and Prejudgment Interest. Plaintiffs counsel submit a proposed judgment for the Courts signature by March 11, 2013. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 02/11/2013. (asp)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 531 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 514 Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude all Set-Offs; and denying 517 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant the Return of ICOA Escrow Funds to Class Members. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 08/09/2011. (tls)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 513 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Regarding Defendant's Proposed Set-Offs for Maintenance Expenses in the "Other" Category. It is hereby ORDERED: (1) That Defendant is prohibited from asserting during the Magistrate Judge Accounting set-of fs against class members escrow funds amounts for specific repair and tire purchases that were not subject to a repayment plan for the reasons previously stated by the magistrate judge in its prior rulings in Docs. # 446 and # 460 ; and (2) Defend ant is prohibited from asserting during the Magistrate Judge Accounting set-offs against class members escrow funds amounts for Comcheck advances for repair and tire purchases because those advances were made by Opportunity Leasing under the VLA, not by England under the ICOA. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on 5/31/2011. (las)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 491 MEMORANDUM DECISION andORDER re 485 Miscellaneous Hearing re C 1. (b) claims. Allocation of payments made by England to Plaintiffs at Final Settlement shall be applied as Plaintiffs propose. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on March 18, 2011. (DN)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 459 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 418 Motion to Clarify April 28, 2009 Order. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 9/30/2010. (las)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 446 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 426 Motion to Exclude. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on 01/28/2010. (asp)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 441 MEMORANDUM DECISION overruling 404 OBJECTIONS to 403 Order. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 12/16/2009. (asp)
May 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER granting 371 Motion for award of prejudgment interest, specifying rates applicable at various times, for types of agreements. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on May 21, 2009. (DN)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 396 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 379 Motion for Notice to Class Members of Court Ruling and Damages Determination ; that on or before 05/11/2009, Plaintiffs shall file a proposed schedule for the resolution and adjudication of set-offs, and Defendant may respond on or before 05/15/2009. These should be filed with regard to Plaintiffs' pending motion for a schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on 05/04/2009. (asp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owner-Operator Ind, et al v. CR England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Murphy
Represented By: David A. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owner-Operator Independent Drivers Association
Represented By: David A. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Piper
Represented By: David A. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Sullivan, Sr.
Represented By: David A. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. England
Represented By: Daniel R. Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?