Lobo Well Service v. Marion Energy
Plaintiff: Lobo Well Service
Defendant: Marion Energy
Counter Claimant: Marion Energy
Counter Defendant: Lobo Well Service
Case Number: 2:2007cv00273
Filed: April 25, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 332 AMENDED MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: granting 298 Motion in Limine to Preclude Marion from Presenting Defenses of Waiver and Estoppel. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 4/18/2011. (las)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 320 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 283 Motion in Limine to Exclude Referenced to Prior or Concurrent Litigation. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 4/15/2011. (las)
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 307 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR AN ADVISORY JURY. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 04/14/2011. (asp)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 272 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 235 Motion to Exclude or Limit Expert Testimony; denying 249 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Kenneth B. Allen; denying 251 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Marc T. Eckels. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 4/8/2011. (las)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 219 AMENDED MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 149 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Marion's Fifth Counterclaim for Relief; denying 151 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Marion's Fourth Counterclaim; denying 153 Motion for P artial Summary Judgment regarding Contract Based Counterclaims and Counterclaim Damages; finding as moot 180 Motion to Strike Portions of the Declaration of Doug Endsley ; finding as moot 182 Motion to Strike Portions of the Declaration of Jerry K. Treybig. finding as moot 188 Motion to Strike Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion ; finding as moot 210 Motion to Strike Errata. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 11/12/2010. (las)
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MEMORANDUM DECISION Denying 134 Lobo's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/7/2009. (ce)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lobo Well Service v. Marion Energy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lobo Well Service
Represented By: Thomas R Karrenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion Energy
Represented By: Dianna M. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Marion Energy
Represented By: Dianna M. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Lobo Well Service
Represented By: Thomas R Karrenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?