Zero Down Supply Chain et al v. Global Transportation Solutions et al
Plaintiff: Zero Down Supply Chain and Brad McBride
Defendant: Global Transportation Solutions, RFQ World, RKC Development, Key Bank of Utah, Global Transportation Management Solutions, Sparrow & Kunz, Shawn Shaw, Pat Cullinane, Thad Harderlie and Valerio De Guevara
Case Number: 2:2007cv00400
Filed: June 18, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Paul G. Cassell
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 498 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 467 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/19/12 (alt)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 497 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 487 Motion for Discovery; denying 492 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Discovery Scheduling Order set. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/16/12 (alt)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM DECISION: the court holds that the Shaw Defendants are entitled to a jury on the question of damages. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 5/21/12 (alt)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 445 Motion to Set Aside Default; granting 450 Motion to Strike 440 Answer to Amended Complaint. The court requests the parties to submit additional briefing on the question of whether a jury may determine the amount of damages within two weeks from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 4/9/12 (alt)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 258 Motion for Order to Show Cause; granting in part and denying in part 295 Motion for Order to Show Cause; granting in part and denying in part 301 Motion for Default Judgment . Default is entered against Defendants RKC Development,Datakab, Thad Haderlie, Shawn Shaw, Global Transportation Management Solutions, and Global Transportaion Solutions. But no default judgment will be entered against defaulting Defendants until after the claims against remaining Defendants have been adjudicated. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 2/5/10 (alt)
October 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: granting in part and denying in part 89 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 95 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 98 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 100 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 10/16/08 (alt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zero Down Supply Chain et al v. Global Transportation Solutions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zero Down Supply Chain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Transportation Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RFQ World
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RKC Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Key Bank of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Transportation Management Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sparrow & Kunz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Cullinane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thad Harderlie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerio De Guevara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?