Lafferty v. Turley
Petitioner: Ronald W. Lafferty
Respondent: Steven Turley
Case Number: 2:2007mc00322
Filed: May 17, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Utah
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 420 Amended MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER re 412 MOTION to Alter Judgment, 414 MOTION to Strike. The Court denies the request for a COA. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 1/19/2018. (blh)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 419 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER denying 412 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying 414 Motion to Strike. The parties are ordered to provide briefing on whether a certificate of appealability should issue. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 1/9/2018. (blh)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 410 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER denying Lafferty's Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 10/4/2017. (blh)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 400 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER denying 381 Motion to Excuse Procedural Defaults Pursuant to Martinez v. Ryan. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 10/5/2016. (blh)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 341 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 94 Sealed Motion for Competency Determination; finding as moot 338 Motion for Leave to Appear ; finding as moot 339 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 1/9/14. (jlw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lafferty v. Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald W. Lafferty
Represented By: Kent R. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steven Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?