Muscat et al v. Prime West Jordanelle
Plaintiff: |
Joseph O. Muscat and Elgene Muscat |
Defendant: |
Prime West Jordanelle, Nathan Welch, Stephen F. Patterson and Scott Macritchie |
Case Number: |
2:2008cv00420 |
Filed: |
May 23, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Utah |
Office: |
Contract: Other Office |
County: |
Utah |
Presiding Judge: |
Ted Stewart |
Presiding Judge: |
Paul M. Warner |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
Diversity |
Jury Demanded By: |
28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 11, 2010 |
Filing
66
MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 50 Motion for Default Judgment ; granting 55 Motion to Set Aside Default ; that Defendant Stephen F. Patterson respond to the Second AmendedComplaint within twenty days ; that the parties eliminate further communication problems by securing the proper addresses and that Defendants respond in a timely manner going forward ; that the hearing set for Friday, January 15, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby stricken. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 01/11/2010. (asp)
|
August 20, 2009 |
Filing
43
MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 39 Motion to Amend/Correct ; granting 41 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David E. Hardy withdrawn from case for Nathan Welch, Prime West Jordanelle. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 08/20/2009. (asp)
|
February 20, 2009 |
Filing
32
MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Charles L. Perschon and Stephen E. Quesenberry withdrawn from case for Prime West Jordanelle, Nathan Welch, Stephen F. Patterson, Scott MacRitchie. The HJ&S attorneys shall n otify defendants in writing of their obligations under rule 83-1.4(b). In the written notification to Prime West, the HJ&S attorneys shall indicate that Prime West is not permitted to appear pro se. Pursuant to rule 83-1.4(b), within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order, Nathan Welch, Stephen F. Patterson, and Scott MacRitchie shall each provide the Court and all counsel of record in this case with a written notice naming new counsel or, alternatively, indicating the decision to appear pro se. If any of the above-referenced individuals retain counsel, said counsel shall promptly file a formal notice of appearance in this case. Prime West shall provide the Court and all counsel of record in this case with a writen notice naming its new counsel. Said counsel shall then promptly file a notice of appearance in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 2/20/2009. (rlr)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?