Simantob v. Mullican Flooring

Plaintiff: Jack Simantob
Defendant: Mullican Flooring
Case Number: 2:2009cv00379
Filed: April 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Kimball
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Ordergranting 141 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Elizabeth A. Knowlton withdrawn from case for Jack Simantob. It is further Ordered that Plaintiff Jack Simantob comply with DUCiv R 83-1.4 within twenty-one (21)days of this order. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 8/5/13. (jmr)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order-denying 120 Motion to Amend/Correct. This case is now closed. Each party shall bear his or its own costs. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 4/27/12. (jmr)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 06/15/2010. (kpf)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint is Grant in Part and Denied in Part as stated abo ve. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint consistent with the court's ruling and including the necessary jurisdictional information for Defendant Derr Flooring, within ten days of the date of this ORDER. The Current deadline is extended to March 26, 2010. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 1/14/2010. (kpf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simantob v. Mullican Flooring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Simantob
Represented By: Elizabeth Knowlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mullican Flooring
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?